Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Gaming - Home Games - Bingo
Sponsored by
Harford County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding bingo in Harford County to the list of home games that an individual may conduct in a common area of a residential property if the property is restricted to residents who are at least 55 years old.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Harford County - Gaming - Home Games - Bingo
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {315567/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Harford County - Gaming - Home Games - Bingo
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-1)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Harford County - Gaming - Home Games - Bingo
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments {315567/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Harford County - Gaming - Home Games - Bingo
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-1) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Age
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:13 PM
Click to return on the top page