Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord and Tenant – Lease Agreements – Estoppel Certificates and Subordination, Non–Disturbance, and Attornment Agreements
Sponsored by
Delegate Conaway
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a landlord from using a lease containing an estoppel certificate or a subordination, non-disturbance, and attornment agreement or requiring a tenant to agree to sign an estoppel certificate or a subordination, non-disturbance, and attornment agreement as a provision of a lease; providing that the Act may not be construed to prohibit a landlord from requesting that a tenant sign a certain separate certificate or agreement; and providing that the Act may not impair an existing obligation or contract right.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/04/2021
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Landlord and Tenant – Lease Agreements – Estoppel Certificates and Subordination, Non–Disturbance, and Attornment Agreements
House 2/04/2021 2/04/2021 Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2021 3/08/2021 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:18 PM
Click to return on the top page