Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Snare Traps – Prohibition Against Sale or Possession – Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegates Hornberger, Anderton, Arikan, Beitzel, Carey, Clark, Cox, Griffith, Jacobs, McComas, McKay, Otto, and Wivell
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a prohibition against possessing a snare trap in certain counties; and repealing a prohibition against using, selling, possessing, setting, placing, or maintaining a snare trap in Cecil County.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {550713/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Snare Traps – Prohibition Against Sale or Possession – Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Snare Traps – Prohibition Against Use, Sale, Possession, Setting, Placing, or Maintaining – Alterations
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments {550713/1 Adopted 43AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Snare Traps – Prohibition Against Sale or Possession – Alterations
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:13 PM
Click to return on the top page