Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Speed Limits - Establishment and Enforcement
Sponsored by
Delegate Wells (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing Baltimore City to decrease or raise to a previously established level the maximum speed limit on a highway under its jurisdiction without performing an engineering and traffic study; and prohibiting a local jurisdiction from implementing a new speed monitoring system to enforce speed limits on any portion of a highway for which the speed limit has been decreased without performing an engineering and traffic investigation.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Speed Limits - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {870814/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Motor Vehicles - Speed Limits - Establishment and Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (124-11)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Baltimore City - Speed Limits - Establishment
House 2/15/2021 2/15/2021 Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {870814/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Motor Vehicles - Speed Limits - Establishment and Enforcement
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (124-11) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2021 3/23/2021 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 3:10 PM
Click to return on the top page