Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Office of the Public Defender - Definition of Serious Offense
Sponsored by
Delegate Wilson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 369
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a certain definition of "serious offense" to remove a certain limitation on offenses that are included for purposes relating to representation by the Office of the Public Defender.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1048
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1017 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 369
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Office of the Public Defender - Definition of Serious Offense
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Office of the Public Defender - Definition of Serious Offense
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 53CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 369
Text - Chapter - Criminal Procedure - Office of the Public Defender - Definition of Serious Offense
(   16-101, 16-204 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:11 PM
Click to return on the top page