Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Board of Community College Trustees for Baltimore County - Collective Bargaining - Faculty
Sponsored by
Delegate Bhandari
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the scope of certain provisions of law governing collective bargaining to include faculty of Baltimore County community colleges; requiring the Board of the Community College Trustees for Baltimore County to establish certain procedures and recognize certain rights of faculty; requiring the Board to adopt certain rules and regulations; and providing that the Act does not authorize a strike by faculty.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Board of Community College Trustees for Baltimore County - Collective Bargaining - Faculty
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:17 PM
Click to return on the top page