Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative Access to New Employees
Sponsored by
Delegate Bridges
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the type of access and the circumstances under which certain access to new employees by exclusive representatives is required to be permitted by the State, a system institution, Morgan State University, St. Mary's College of Maryland, and Baltimore City Community College; requiring that an exclusive representative have at least 30 minutes to meet with a new employee; authorizing an exclusive representative and a new employee to meet by video or similar technology if public health concerns necessitate that a meeting be held remotely; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0717
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {714469/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-38)
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
4/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {117570/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-41)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative Access to New Employees
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments {714469/1 Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative Access to New Employees
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Third Reading Passed (95-38) 25AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Referred Finance 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 4/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments {117570/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Third Reading Passed (95-41) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative Access to New Employees
Last Updated: 4/9/2021 10:28 AM
Click to return on the top page