Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development – Maryland Technology Infrastructure Pilot Program – Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegate Buckel
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Technology Infrastructure Pilot Program in the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to support and incentivize advanced industry infrastructure and resources that build on the existing strengths of the Western Maryland economy; establishing the Maryland Technology Infrastructure authority; establishing the Maryland Technology Infrastructure Fund to award financial assistance to public and private entities to support projects in Western Maryland; requiring a certain report; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0709
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {445966/1 Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Economic Development – Maryland Technology Infrastructure Pilot Program – Establishment
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments {445966/1 Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Economic Development – Maryland Technology Infrastructure Pilot Program – Establishment
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Finance 30 Click to view Recorded Media
(   10-4C-01 through 10-4C-10 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:16 PM
Click to return on the top page