Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Foreign Corporations - Resident Agents - State Department of Assessments and Taxation
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Assessments and Taxation)
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a foreign corporation to certify that the State Department of Assessments and Taxation is the corporation's resident agent when registering or qualifying with the Department; authorizing the Department to act as a resident agent for a foreign corporation that does business in the State without a resident agent or with a resident agent who cannot be found or served with the exercise of reasonable diligence; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Foreign Corporations - Resident Agents - State Department of Assessments and Taxation
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Foreign Corporations - Resident Agents - State Department of Assessments and Taxation
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Rules 49 Click to view Recorded Media
(   7-202, 7-203, 7-205 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:10 PM
Click to return on the top page