Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Paint Stewardship Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Boyce, Atterbeary, Bridges, Ebersole, Hettleman, Lehman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Shetty, Smith, Terrasa, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain producers or a representative organization to submit a plan for the establishment of a Paint Stewardship Program to the Department of the Environment on or before January 1, 2021, and in accordance with certain requirements; requiring the Department to review and approve certain plans, including a certain assessment, submitted in accordance with the Paint Stewardship Program; prohibiting the sale of certain architectural paint under certain circumstances on a certain date; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Paint Stewardship Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {380112/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Paint Stewardship Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-35)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Text - First - Maryland Paint Stewardship Program
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {380112/1 Adopted 49BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Paint Stewardship Program
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (98-35) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 51AClick to view Recorded Media
(   9-1701, 9-1702, 9-1707, 9-1733 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:10 PM
Click to return on the top page