Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electric Companies - Billing Information
Sponsored by
Delegates Howard, Bartlett, Cain, Carey, Chang, Chisholm, Rogers, and Saab
Status
In the House - Special Order until 3/18 (Delegate T. Branch) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an electric company to provide to a retail electricity customer on request the historic usage and billing information for not less than the preceding 12 months; and providing that the electric company must make the information available in a certain manner.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electric Companies - Billing Information
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {383490/1
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/18 (Delegate Branch) Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Electric Companies - Billing Information
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments {383490/1 51A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/18 (Delegate Branch) Adopted 51A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:10 PM