Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Civil Actions - Liability of Toxic Substance Manufacturers
Sponsored by
Delegates Mosby, Anderson, Attar, C. Branch, Bridges, Conaway, R. Lewis, Lierman, McIntosh, Rosenberg, Smith, and Wells
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that the Act applies only to an action against a certain manufacturer of a toxic substance for damages allegedly caused by the presence of paint or surface coatings containing the toxic substance in a residential building located in Baltimore City; defining "toxic substance" as a component used in paint or other surface coatings, including lead pigment, that is harmful to human health and the environment; providing that it is the intent of the General Assembly that the Act be liberally construed by the courts; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1191 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Reassigned to Environment and Transportation Judiciary
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Baltimore City - Civil Actions - Liability of Toxic Substance Manufacturers
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Reassigned to Environment and Transportation Judiciary 23
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-2201 through 3-2205 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:10 PM