Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unregulated Space in Hospital Operating Suites Pilot Project Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Bagnall, Chang, McComas, and Pendergrass
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Health Services Cost Review Commission to conduct a study, in conjunction with the Maryland Health Care Commission and certain stakeholders, on the feasibility and desirability of allowing for an unregulated space for elective, self-paying patients in a hospital operating room as a pilot project; and requiring the Health Services Cost Review Commission to report to the Senate Finance Committee and the House Health and Government Operations Committee by June 30, 2021, on the results and findings of the study.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Unregulated Space in Hospital Operating Suites Pilot Project Study
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Unregulated Space in Hospital Operating Suites Pilot Project Study
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:08 PM
Click to return on the top page