Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilkins, Acevero, Charkoudian, D.M. Davis, Feldmark, W. Fisher, Ivey, J. Lewis, Moon, and Stewart
Status
In the House - Recommitted to Judiciary (Delegate Clippinger)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Awarding a diminution credit of 90 days to reduce the term of confinement of an inmate if the inmate successfully obtains a certain educational certificate, diploma, or degree; prohibiting an inmate who is serving a certain sexual offense from receiving the diminution credit; requiring the Commissioner of Correction to establish a uniform system of deductions and participation criteria for awarding a certain diminution credit; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0922
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0621 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate T. Branch) Adopted
Proceedings
47BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate T. Branch) Adopted 47BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
(   3-706.1, 3-708 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:07 PM
Click to return on the top page