Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Construction - Electric Vehicle Charging
Sponsored by
Delegate Terrasa
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a builder of new housing units including single-family detached homes and townhomes or a builder's agent to provide each buyer or prospective buyer with the option to include on or in a garage, carport, or driveway an electric vehicle charging station or a dedicated electric line capable of providing at least level 2 charging; requiring a certain builder or builder's agent to give to certain buyers and prospective buyers notice of certain options and information about certain rebate programs; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1316 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Residential Construction - Electric Vehicle Charging
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {540514/1 Adopted
Proceedings
17BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Barve) Adopted
Proceedings
17BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
17BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Barve) Adopted
Proceedings
17CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Residential Construction - Electric Vehicle Charging
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-38)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/12 (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-7)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Residential Construction - Electric Vehicle Charging
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/02/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments {540514/1 Adopted 17BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2021 2/26/2021 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Barve) Adopted 17BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2021 2/26/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted 17BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2021 2/26/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Barve) Adopted 17CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Residential Construction - Electric Vehicle Charging
House 3/05/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (93-38) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 2/22/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Motion Special Order until 4/12 (Senator Ready) Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Second Reading Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (39-7) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/30/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
(   12-205 )
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 10:14 AM
Click to return on the top page