Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Establishment of Regional Centers for Women Veterans
Sponsored by
Delegate Kittleman
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Establishment of Regional Centers for Women Veterans to analyze the resources available to women veterans in the State; requiring the Task Force to make recommendations regarding ways to address identified specific needs for services for women veterans residing in the State and to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by October 1, 2022; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1600 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Task Force to Study the Establishment of Regional Centers for Women Veterans
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:00 PM
Click to return on the top page