Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Nondepository Special Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates Howard, Arentz, Bartlett, Carey, Chisholm, Cox, Impallaria, Kipke, Malone, McComas, Qi, Rogers, Saab, Valderrama, and Walker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 320
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Including in the Nondepository Special Fund certain fees, assessments, or revenue received by the Commissioner of Financial Regulation associated with the Commissioner's authority to investigate complaints of violations by credit card processors; requiring the Commissioner to pay into the General Fund of the State certain fines and penalties collected by the Commissioner from credit card processors; altering the purpose of the Nondepository Special Fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0409
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {443790/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
38A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 320
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Nondepository Special Fund
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Favorable with Amendments {443790/1 Adopted 36
House 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
Text - Third - Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Nondepository Special Fund
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 38
Senate 3/02/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Finance 38A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 320
Text - Chapter - Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Nondepository Special Fund
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:05 PM