Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
**Veto override
   HB0737 - 2020RS
   CH0026 - 2021RS
Title
Local Governments - Income Tax Disparity Grants - Amounts
Sponsored by
Delegates Anderton, B. Barnes, and Sample-Hughes
Status
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 26 of 2021
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of certain income tax disparity grants to counties and Baltimore City under certain circumstances and for certain fiscal years; and repealing a certain termination provision.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Local Governments - Income Tax Disparity Grants - Amounts
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {244464/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Local Governments - Income Tax Disparity Grants - Amounts
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {349335/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Local Governments - Income Tax Disparity Grants - Amounts
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/07/2020
Legislative Date
5/07/2020
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/8 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/11 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Overridden (114-18)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until later today (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Overridden (31-15)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 26 of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Local Governments - Income Tax Disparity Grants - Amounts
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Local Governments - Income Tax Disparity Grants - Amounts
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {244464/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Local Governments - Income Tax Disparity Grants - Amounts
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (127-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {349335/1 Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 51AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 House Concurs Senate Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Local Governments - Income Tax Disparity Grants - Amounts
Post Passage 5/07/2020 5/07/2020 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/8 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/11 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Overridden (114-18)
Senate 2/12/2021 2/10/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until later today (Senator King) Adopted
Senate 2/12/2021 2/10/2021 Overridden (31-15)
House 2/12/2021 2/10/2021 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 26 of 2021
Text - Chapter - Local Governments - Income Tax Disparity Grants - Amounts
(   2016, 2018 )
Last Updated: 2/23/2021 10:34 AM
Click to return on the top page