Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Training of Health Care Professionals
Sponsored by
Delegate McComas
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to provide certain boards that are authorized to take actions against persons who knowingly fail to report suspected child abuse with a list of courses relating to the obligation to report child abuse and neglect and the identification of abused and neglected children; requiring certain boards to post certain information on each board's website, provide information about recommended courses to certain health care professionals, or advertise the availability of certain courses; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1252 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Child Abuse and Neglect - Training of Health Care Professionals
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Child Abuse and Neglect - Training of Health Care Professionals
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Child Abuse and Neglect - Training of Health Care Professionals
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2021 3/12/2021 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/12/2021 3/04/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Child Abuse and Neglect - Training of Health Care Professionals
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:58 PM
Click to return on the top page