Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Special Education Ombudsman
Sponsored by
Delegates Washington and Ivey
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Special Education Ombudsman in the Office of the Attorney General to serve as a resource for information and support to parents, students, and educators regarding special education rights and services; requiring the Ombudsman to submit a certain report concerning the State's special education services by July 1, 2022, and each July 1 thereafter; requiring certain school personnel to provide the parents of a child with a disability written information about the Ombudsman and the toll-free telephone number; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0504
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Office of the Attorney General - Special Education Ombudsman
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {135266/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Office of the Attorney General - Special Education Ombudsman
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-1)
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Office of the Attorney General - Special Education Ombudsman
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable with Amendments {135266/1 Adopted 42
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Text - Third - Office of the Attorney General - Special Education Ombudsman
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-1) 43A
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-501 through 6-506 )
Last Updated: 3/20/2020 9:11 AM