Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Board of License Commissioners - Chief Inspector
Sponsored by
Delegate Rogers
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of License Commissioners for Anne Arundel County to employ a chief inspector; and providing an annual salary for the chief inspector of $30,000.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0490
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Board of License Commissioners - Chief Inspector
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {203799/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Board of License Commissioners - Chief Inspector
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {154638/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Board of License Commissioners - Chief Inspector
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2021 3/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/12/2021 3/04/2021 Favorable with Amendments {203799/1 Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2021 3/04/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Board of License Commissioners - Chief Inspector
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2021 3/30/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2021 3/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments {154638/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2021 3/08/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/09/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/5/2021 10:58 AM
Click to return on the top page