Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Services - Facilities - Garrett Children's Center
Sponsored by
Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Departmental - Juvenile Services)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 297
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Including the Garrett Children's Center as a facility the Department of Juvenile Services is authorized to operate for the diagnosis, care, training, education, and rehabilitation of certain children.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Services - Facilities - Garrett Children's Center
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Juvenile Services - Facilities - Garrett Children's Center
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 297
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Juvenile Services - Facilities - Garrett Children's Center
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Juvenile Services - Facilities - Garrett Children's Center
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Juvenile Services - Facilities - Garrett Children's Center
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Rules 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 297
Text - Chapter - Juvenile Services - Facilities - Garrett Children's Center
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:00 PM
Click to return on the top page