Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Support - Annual Collection Fee
Sponsored by
Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Departmental - Human Services)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 291
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Conforming the maximum amount of a certain annual fee for the collection of child support by the Child Support Administration to the amount authorized under a certain federal law.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Child Support - Annual Collection Fee
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Child Support - Annual Collection Fee
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-36)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-3)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 291
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Child Support - Annual Collection Fee
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Child Support - Annual Collection Fee
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Child Support - Annual Collection Fee
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (97-36) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Rules 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (43-3) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 291
Text - Chapter - Child Support - Annual Collection Fee
(   10-110 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:00 PM
Click to return on the top page