Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law – Automobile Financing Charges – Required Dealer Disclosures
Sponsored by
Delegates Queen, Charkoudian, D.M. Davis, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Shetty, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Special Order until 3/18 (Delegate Dumais) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a dealer who participates in finance charges associated with a contract for the sale of a vehicle to disclose certain information to a buyer in writing on a document that is separate from the financing agreement before executing a financing agreement on a contract for the sale of a vehicle; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {243894/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Delegate Dumais) Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {973824/1 (Delegate Dumais) Adopted
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/18 (Delegate Dumais) Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Automobile Financing Charges - Required Dealer Disclosures
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {243894/1 Adopted 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Delegate Dumais) Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Floor Amendment {973824/1 (Delegate Dumais) Adopted 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Commercial Law – Automobile Financing Charges – Required Dealer Disclosures
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/18 (Delegate Dumais) Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
(   12-609.1 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:00 PM
Click to return on the top page