Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County Tax Fairness Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Korman, Acevero, Barve, Carr, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, Cullison, Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Kaiser, Kelly, Lopez, Love, Luedtke, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Qi, Queen, Reznik, Shetty, Solomon, Stewart, and Wilkins
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 632
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the manner by which the Comptroller withholds from certain income tax distributions certain amounts that a local government owes to the Local Reserve Account for its share of certain income tax refunds and interest that are paid from the Account related to a certain decision of the U.S. Supreme Court.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - County Tax Fairness Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - County Tax Fairness Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 632
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - County Tax Fairness Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - County Tax Fairness Act
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - County Tax Fairness Act
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (128-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 632
Text - Chapter - County Tax Fairness Act
(   2015, 2016, 2018 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:58 PM
Click to return on the top page