Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety – Lost or Stolen Regulated Firearm – Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegate Clippinger
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering penalties applicable to failing to report a lost or stolen regulated firearm.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1050
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety – Lost or Stolen Regulated Firearm – Reporting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Hornberger) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {263521/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (45-88)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety – Lost or Stolen Regulated Firearm – Reporting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-44)
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {138272/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety – Lost or Stolen Regulated Firearm – Reporting
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Hornberger) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Floor Amendment {263521/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (45-88) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety – Lost or Stolen Regulated Firearm – Reporting
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (89-44) 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments {138272/1 Adopted 52AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53BClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:57 PM
Click to return on the top page