Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Aging - Assisted Living Program Subsidies - Determinations
Sponsored by
Valentino-Smith,, Bagnall, Boyce, Cardin, Carr, Charkoudian, Feldmark, Guyton, Henson, Kelly, R. Lewis, McIntosh, Rosenberg, Solomon, Stein, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Aging to pay to certain low-income seniors up to a $1,500 subsidy from State general funds to help low-income seniors reside in assisted living programs; increasing, except under certain circumstances, a certain subsidy in effect for certain periods of time based on annual growth in the consumer price index; requiring an applicable area agency to determine the amount of the monthly subsidy for a resident of an assisted living program and, in doing so, to make a certain deduction for personal expenses; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0670
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Reassigned to Appropriations
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {384763/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-3)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Finance Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Department of Aging - Assisted Living Program Subsidies - Determinations
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Reassigned to Appropriations 20 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {384763/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Aging - Assisted Living Program Subsidies - Determinations
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (135-3) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Finance Budget and Taxation 46 Click to view Recorded Media
(   10-211 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:56 PM
Click to return on the top page