Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Scooter and Electric Low Speed Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access
Sponsored by
Delegates Attar, Arikan, Bagnall, Boyce, Brooks, Carr, Chang, Charles, Clark, Cullison, Feldmark, Forbes, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Guyton, Haynes, Hettleman, Hill, Korman, Krebs, Krimm, Lehman, Lierman, Lopez, Malone, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Shetty, Smith, Solomon, Stein, Stewart, Anderton, Barve, Ciliberti, Harrison, Healey, Holmes, Jacobs, Love, Otto, Ruth, Terrasa, Wells, Wivell
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 252
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that motor scooter and electric low speed scooter sharing companies include on each motor scooter or electric low speed scooter made available to the public an embossed tactile display with contact information through which an individual who is blind or visually impaired may contact the company; requiring that motor scooter and electric low speed scooter sharing companies provide individuals with disabilities certain nonvisual access to their websites and mobile applications consistent with certain federal standards; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0607
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1243 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor and Electric Scooter Sharing Companies - Nonvisual Access
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {960215/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 252
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Motor and Electric Scooter Sharing Companies - Nonvisual Access
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {960215/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Motor Scooter and Electric Low Speed Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Finance 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 252
Text - Chapter - Motor Scooter and Electric Low Speed Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access
(   11-117.2, 11-134.5, 18.7-101, 18.7-102 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:55 PM
Click to return on the top page