Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Maryland Children's Service Animal Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Pendergrass, Pena-Melnyk, Reilly, Carr, Kelly, Bagnall, Chisholm, Morgan, Hill, R. Lewis, Rosenberg, Bhandari, Kipke, K. Young, Szeliga, Kerr, Charles, Cullison, Johnson, and Saab
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 247
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Children's Service Animal Program in the Maryland Department of Health to serve the needs of children with a history of trauma, post-traumatic stress disorder, or who have been diagnosed with a certain disability and special health care need by teaching them to partner with a service or support dog or to interact with therapy horses; requiring the Department to select at least one nonprofit entity to select Program participants, support dogs, or therapy horses, and facilitate training or therapy; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0455
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health - Maryland Children's Service Animal Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {306581/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health - Maryland Children's Service Animal Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 247
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Health - Maryland Children's Service Animal Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health - Maryland Children's Service Animal Program - Establishment
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments {306581/1 Adopted 43AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health - Maryland Children's Service Animal Program - Establishment
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Finance 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 247
Text - Chapter - Health - Maryland Children's Service Animal Program - Establishment
(   13-4101 through 13-4106 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:55 PM
Click to return on the top page