Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners – Cease and Desist Orders and Civil Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Griffith, Adams, Anderton, Arentz, Beitzel, Boyce, Buckel, Charkoudian, Corderman, Ebersole, Hartman, Hornberger, Impallaria, Jacobs, Johnson, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, Long, Mangione, McComas, McKay, Metzgar, Moon, Otto, Palakovich Carr, Parrott, Reilly, Shetty, Shoemaker, Szeliga, C. Watson, R. Watson, Wilson, and P. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 243
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing, on review and approval of the Secretary of Agriculture or the Secretary's designee, the State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners to issue a cease and desist order against a person who practices, attempts to practice, or offers to practice veterinary medicine in violation of certain laws or takes certain actions; specifying that a civil penalty imposed under the Act may not exceed $5,000 for a first offense or $10,000 for a second or subsequent offense; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0189
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Reassigned to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {990415/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 243
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Practicing Veterinary Medicine Without a License - Cease and Desist Order and Civil Penalty
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Reassigned to Environment and Transportation 17 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments {990415/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners – Cease and Desist Orders and Civil Penalties
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 243
Text - Chapter - State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners – Cease and Desist Orders and Civil Penalties
(   2-313.2 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:55 PM
Click to return on the top page