Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Governments - Resilience Authorities - Authorization
Sponsored by
Delegates C. Watson and Lierman
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 235
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a local government to create a Resilience Authority by local law; specifying certain requirements for the adoption of a local law establishing an Authority; specifying the powers that a local government may grant an Authority; authorizing an Authority to issue certain bonds for certain purposes; authorizing a local governing body to dedicate certain revenues of the local government to the repayment of bonds for certain operations and projects of an Authority; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0457
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Local Governments - Resilience Authorities - Authorization
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {920714/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Local Governments - Resilience Authorities - Authorization
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (110-20)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
52AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
52AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 235
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Local Governments - Resilience Authorities - Authorization
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Local Governments - Resilience Authorities - Authorization
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {920714/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Local Governments - Resilience Authorities - Authorization
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (110-20) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Second Reading Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted 52AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 52AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 235
Text - Chapter - Local Governments - Resilience Authorities - Authorization
(   22-101 through 22-113 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:54 PM
Click to return on the top page