Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Surcharge on Recordable Instruments
Sponsored by
Delegates McIntosh and Clippinger (By Request - Maryland Judicial Conference)
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing, from $20 to $40, the amount of the surcharge on certain recordable instruments that the State Court Administrator is required to establish for the Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0256
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {472619/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/4 (Delegate Krebs) Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/5 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (41-91)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-41)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {498275/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Surcharge on Recordable Instruments
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments {472619/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/4 (Delegate Krebs) Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/5 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (41-91) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Surcharge on Recordable Instruments
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (95-41) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {498275/1 Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:54 PM
Click to return on the top page