Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Social Workers - Scope of Practice, Supervision, and Application Decision Appeal Process
Sponsored by
Delegate Cullison
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "practice social work" to include counseling for alcohol and drug use and addictive behaviors and to clarify that it includes, for certain individuals, the treatment of biopsychosocial conditions under the supervision of a licensed social worker-clinical; requiring the State Board of Social Work Examiners, under certain circumstances, to approve licensees approved to engage in independent practice to provide supervision; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0245
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {986980/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Occupations - Social Workers - Scope of Practice, Supervision, and Application Decision Appeal Process
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Favorable with Amendments {986980/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Social Workers - Scope of Practice, Supervision, and Application Decision Appeal Process
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43 Click to view Recorded Media
(   19-101, 19-302, 19-303 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:54 PM
Click to return on the top page