Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Districts - Legislative Districting Plan References
Sponsored by
Delegate T. Branch
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Updating certain provisions of law regarding Baltimore City alcoholic beverages districts to refer to the Legislative Districting Plan of 2012 rather than the corresponding plan of 2002; requiring the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City to grant a certain exemption to certain persons under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0472
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {153890/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Districts - Legislative Districting Plan References
House 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2021 3/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/12/2021 3/04/2021 Favorable with Amendments {153890/1 Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2021 3/04/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Districts - Legislative Districting Plan References
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 9:27 AM
Click to return on the top page