Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency Proceedings
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a federal home loan bank may not be stayed or prohibited from exercising certain rights with respect to certain collateral of a certain insurer-member after the 14th day following the filing of a delinquency proceeding; requiring a federal home loan bank to repurchase certain outstanding capital stock of a certain insurer-member under certain circumstances; requiring a federal home loan bank to establish a certain timeline and process within 10 business days after a request from a receiver; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0458
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency Proceedings
House 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency Proceedings
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/26/2021 10:25 AM
Click to return on the top page