Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Internal Revenue Code Amendments - Decoupling
Sponsored by
Delegate Palakovich Carr
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (41-6)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting, except under certain circumstances, the retroactive application of certain amendments to the Internal Revenue Code to the determination of Maryland taxable income; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2020.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {115667/1 Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax - Internal Revenue Code Amendments - Decoupling
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-3)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-6)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Internal Revenue Code Amendments and the Federal CARES Act - Decoupling
House 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments {115667/1 Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax - Internal Revenue Code Amendments - Decoupling
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Third Reading Passed (127-3) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Budget and Taxation 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2021 3/23/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Motion Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Ready) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (41-6) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 3:47 PM
Click to return on the top page