Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Small Business Development Center Network Fund - Minimum Appropriation
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Barnes, Lierman, Barve, Corderman, Crosby, Crutchfield, Cullison, M. Fisher, Gilchrist, Ivey, Patterson, Stewart, and Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the required minimum appropriation for the Small Business Development Center Network Fund from $950,000 to $1,500,000 for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2021.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0493
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Small Business Development Center Network Fund - Minimum Appropriation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Small Business Development Center Network Fund - Minimum Appropriation
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/12/2020 10:17 AM