Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity - Change of Address - Maintenance of Subscriptions and Contracts
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a subscriber to a community solar energy generating system who has a change in the service address associated with the subscription to maintain the subscription under certain circumstances; prohibiting an electric company or a subscription organization from terminating a subscriber's subscription due to a change of a certain address under certain circumstances; requiring an electric company to make certain changes to accommodate a subscriber's change of address under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0079
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {843495/1 Adopted
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Electricity - Change of Address - Maintenance of Subscriptions and Contracts
House 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments {843495/1 Adopted 10 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Electricity - Change of Address - Maintenance of Subscriptions and Contracts
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 11 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Referred Finance 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 12:56 PM
Click to return on the top page