Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Alterations and Compliance Fees
Sponsored by
Delegate Rogers
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the renewable energy portfolio standard for certain years; extending indefinitely the renewable energy portfolio standard percentage derived from Tier 2 renewable sources; repealing the limit on the period of time during which energy from a Tier 2 renewable source is eligible for inclusion in meeting the renewable energy portfolio standard; altering the compliance fee for a shortfall from the required percentage of energy from certain Tier 1 renewable sources for the renewable energy portfolio standard; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0316
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Hydroelectric Power
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {923196/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Alterations and Compliance Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-37)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Hydroelectric Power
House 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments {923196/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Alterations and Compliance Fees
House 4/02/2021 3/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (95-37) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Referred Rules 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/7/2021 1:17 PM
Click to return on the top page