Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Application of Premium Tax - Continued Exclusion of Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the Senate - Reassigned to Finance and Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a certain termination provision for the purpose of continuing the exclusion of the Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund from the list of insurance companies and other persons that are subject to a certain premium tax.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0149
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {573691/1 Adopted
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Reassigned to Finance Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Insurance - Application of Premium Tax - Continued Exclusion of Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
House 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments {573691/1 Adopted 10 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Insurance - Application of Premium Tax - Continued Exclusion of Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 11 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Referred Budget and Taxation 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Reassigned to Finance Budget and Taxation 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 12:56 PM
Click to return on the top page