Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Practitioners – Telehealth and Shortage
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Bagnall, Bhandari, Charles, Cullison, Kelly, Kerr, R. Lewis, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Sample-Hughes, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 15
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing certain health care practitioners to establish a practitioner-patient relationship through telehealth interactions; requiring a health care practitioner providing telehealth services to be held to the same standards of practice that are applicable to in-person settings and, if clinically appropriate, provide or refer a patient for in-patient services or another type of telehealth service; prohibiting a health care practitioner from prescribing a certain opiate through telehealth except under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0402
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Care Practitioners - Telehealth
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {956186/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Care Practitioners - Telehealth
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-6)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {184632/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {383622/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {983426/2 (Senator McCray) Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-2)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Health Care Practitioners – Telehealth and Shortage
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/03/2020
Legislative Date
4/03/2020
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 15
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Health Care Practitioners – Telehealth and Shortage
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Care Practitioners - Telehealth
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Favorable with Amendments {956186/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Care Practitioners - Telehealth
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-6) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments {184632/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Floor Amendment {383622/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Floor Amendment {983426/2 (Senator McCray) Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 House Concurs Senate Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-2) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Health Care Practitioners – Telehealth and Shortage
Post Passage 4/03/2020 4/03/2020 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 15
Text - Chapter - Health Care Practitioners – Telehealth and Shortage
(   1-1001 through 1-1006 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:50 PM
Click to return on the top page