Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on the Economic Future of Western Maryland
Sponsored by
Delegates Buckel, Hornberger, Rose, and Shoemaker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 207
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on the Economic Future of Western Maryland to study the current economic conditions of Western Maryland and make recommendations regarding ways to expand economic opportunity in the region; providing for the membership of the Task Force and the appointment of a Senate cochair and a House cochair; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2021; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0873 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {625365/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Task Force on the Economic Future of Western Maryland
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 207
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Task Force on the Economic Future of Western Maryland
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Task Force on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {625365/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Task Force on the Economic Future of Western Maryland
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 207
Text - Chapter - Task Force on the Economic Future of Western Maryland
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:50 PM
Click to return on the top page