Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Participation of School-Based Health Centers - Regulations
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison, Pendergrass, Pena-Melnyk, Bagnall, Belcastro, Bhandari, Carr, Charles, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, R. Lewis, Rosenberg, and K. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 198
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health on or before January 1, 2021, to revise its regulations regarding school-based health centers that may participate in the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to include school-based health centers that have a written agreement with a sponsoring agency that meets certain requirements identified by the State Department of Education in the version of the "Maryland School-Based Health Center Standards" report available December 1, 2019; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {786684/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 198
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Participation of School-Based Health Centers - Regulations
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {786684/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Participation of School-Based Health Centers - Regulations
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Finance 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 198
Text - Chapter - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Participation of School-Based Health Centers - Regulations
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:49 PM
Click to return on the top page