Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Unattended Dogs in Extreme Weather Conditions
Sponsored by
Delegates Lehman, K. Young, Acevero, Bartlett, Cardin, Carr, Chang, Feldmark, Fraser-Hidalgo, Ivey, Kaiser, Kelly, Krebs, Krimm, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Lopez, McIntosh, Palakovich Carr, Pena-Melnyk, Rose, Shoemaker, Solomon, Stein, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Arentz, Attar, Barve, Charles, Ciliberti, Healey, Holmes, Jalisi, Love, Ruth, Stewart, Terrasa
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from leaving a dog outside and unattended for longer than 30 minutes without access to continuous suitable shelter during extreme weather conditions, subject to certain exceptions; making a violation a civil offense; applying certain penalties; and defining the terms "suitable shelter," "sporting," and "extreme weather conditions".
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0627
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Crimes - Unattended Dogs in Extreme Weather Conditions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Reassigned to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {450618/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Crimes - Unattended Dogs in Extreme Weather Conditions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-7)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Crimes - Unattended Dogs in Extreme Weather Conditions
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Reassigned to Environment and Transportation 19 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {450618/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Crimes - Unattended Dogs in Extreme Weather Conditions
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (125-7) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 50 Click to view Recorded Media
(   10-623 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:48 PM
Click to return on the top page