Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Eligibility - Hardship Exception
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a certain financial hardship exception, under certain circumstances, to a prohibition against granting the homeowners' property tax credit to a homeowner whose combined gross income exceeds $60,000; requiring a homeowner, in order to qualify for the hardship exception, to include certain information in the homeowner's application for the tax credit; authorizing a homeowner who is denied a hardship exception to appeal the denial under certain circumstances; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2021; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/08/2020
Legislative Date
10/08/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Eligibility - Hardship Exception
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/08/2020 10/08/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Eligibility - Hardship Exception
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 9:34 AM
Click to return on the top page