Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Probation
Sponsored by
Delegate Valentino-Smith
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring that the duration of a term of probation for a child be consistent with any treatment and rehabilitation needs identified for the child; specifying that the duration of a term of probation may not exceed a certain period of time, except under certain circumstances; and authorizing the juvenile court to require an additional term of probation, not to exceed 1 year, if the court determines after a hearing that additional time is needed to meet the child's treatment and rehabilitation needs.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0581 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/13/2020
Legislative Date
10/13/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Probation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/13/2020 10/13/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Probation
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/22/2021 2/22/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:34 PM
Click to return on the top page