Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Governing Bodies of Common Ownership Communities - Member Training
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each member of a board of directors or officer of a council of unit owners of a condominium and each member of a governing body of a homeowners association to successfully complete a certain training curriculum within 90 days after the individual is first elected or appointed or, for an individual in office on October 1, 2021, begins a subsequent term; requiring a certain governing body to certify that a certain member or officer has completed certain training and retain copies of certain certificates; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1054 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/02/2020
Legislative Date
10/02/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/02/2020 10/02/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Real Property - Governing Bodies of Common Ownership Communities - Member Training
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/29/2021 12:45 PM
Click to return on the top page