Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Notice of License Application
Sponsored by
Anne Arundel County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 170
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Anne Arundel County to fulfill a certain notice requirement by posting online a completed application for an alcoholic beverages license at least 10 days before the application hearing; and altering a certain notice provision to require the applicant for an alcoholic beverages license, rather than the Board, to post a suitable notice at the location described in the application for at least 10 days before the application hearing.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0180
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {383893/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 170
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Notice of License Application
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Favorable with Amendments {383893/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Notice of License Application
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 170
Text - Chapter - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Notice of License Application
(   11-102, 11-1508, 4-208 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:45 PM
Click to return on the top page