Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Policy on Student Concerns About Athletic Programs and Activities - Short Title
Sponsored by
Delegates Hettleman and Lierman
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the short title "Jordan McNair Act" for Subtitle 16 of Title 11 of the Education Article.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0027
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Higher Education - Policy on Student Concerns About Athletic Programs and Activities - Short Title
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - Policy on Student Concerns About Athletic Programs and Activities - Short Title
House 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 28 Click to view Recorded Media
(   11-1602 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:45 PM
Click to return on the top page