Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Talbot County – Deer and Turkey Hunting – Sundays
Sponsored by
Delegate Mautz
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person to hunt deer on each Sunday of the deer hunting seasons from the first Sunday in October through the second Sunday in January, inclusive, in Talbot County; and authorizing the Department to allow a person to hunt turkey each Sunday of the spring turkey hunting season in Talbot County.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0475
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/06/2020
Legislative Date
10/06/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Talbot County – Deer and Turkey Hunting – Sundays
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {560915/1 Adopted
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Talbot County – Deer and Turkey Hunting – Sundays
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-8)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/06/2020 10/06/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Talbot County – Deer and Turkey Hunting – Sundays
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Favorable with Amendments {560915/1 Adopted 19 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Talbot County – Deer and Turkey Hunting – Sundays
House 3/05/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (122-8) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 2/22/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:33 PM
Click to return on the top page